Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Marie Fernand Housset

Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1940 Born
29 Jun 196525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
17 May 199655.9AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
15 Sep 199656.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
28 Nov 200666.4AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
7 Jan 200766.5InstalledBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
9 Mar 201675.7RetiredBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Bernard Marie Fernand Housset (VIAF: 9847903)
Bishop Bernard Marie Fernand Housset (born ) Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Michel-de-Port
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montauban, Diocese of Montauban

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,791
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2016
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast