Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Charles Collini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1921BornTunis
20 Sep 194725.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 196240.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ajaccio, France
7 Sep 196240.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zephyrium
7 Oct 196240.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zephyrium
26 Jul 196644.7SucceededBishop of Ajaccio, France
22 Dec 197251.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
22 Dec 197251.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Salapia
16 Nov 197857.0SucceededArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
3 Dec 199675.0RetiredArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
10 Nov 200382.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France

MicroData Summary for André Charles Collini:
Archbishop André Charles Collini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 167
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013