Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Marie-Maurice Perrin

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ethiopia

Titular Archbishop of Gurza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1904BornGrenoble, France
29 Jun 193632.0Ordained PriestPriest of Carthage, Tunisia
7 Jun 194742.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
7 Jun 194742.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
28 Oct 194743.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
29 Oct 195349.3AppointedArchbishop of Carthage, Tunisia
9 Jul 196460.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nova
9 Jul 196460.0AppointedPrelate of Tunis, Tunisia
9 Jan 196560.5ResignedPrelate of Tunis, Tunisia
31 Jul 196561.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Iraq
2 Aug 196561.1AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
14 Oct 196662.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iraq
16 Jan 197065.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gurza
16 Jan 197065.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ethiopia
15 Nov 197268.4ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ethiopia
3 Oct 199490.3DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie-Maurice Perrin:
Archbishop Paul-Marie-Maurice Perrin (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Ethiopia

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013