Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Albert Gounot, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Carthage


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1884BornVilleurbanne, France
25 May 190723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
14 Aug 193753.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Carthage, Tunisia
14 Aug 193753.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
28 Oct 193753.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
16 May 193955.4SucceededArchbishop of Carthage, Tunisia
20 Jun 195369.5DiedArchbishop of Carthage, Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Charles-Albert Gounot:
Archbishop Charles-Albert Gounot C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Carthage

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013