Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Marie-Victor Fresnel, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort-Dauphin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1897BornChantepie, France
20 Sep 192427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
4 Feb 195355.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cataquas
4 Mar 195355.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin, Madagascar
4 Jun 195355.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cataquas
14 Sep 195558.1AppointedBishop of Fort-Dauphin, Madagascar
26 Sep 196871.1ResignedBishop of Fort-Dauphin, Madagascar
26 Sep 196871.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Siminina
21 Jul 197173.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Siminina
18 Oct 198386.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort-Dauphin, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Marie-Victor Fresnel:
Bishop Alphonse-Marie-Victor Fresnel C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort-Dauphin

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015