Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Dusio, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ihosy, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1920Born
21 Dec 194626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 Apr 196746.9AppointedBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar
22 Oct 196747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar
2 Nov 197050.5DiedBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Luigi Dusio
Bishop Luigi Dusio C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ihosy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasorzo, Italy

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018