Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tôlagnaro

Dioecesis Tolagnarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 23 November 1989
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Toliara
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 45,000 (17,381 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesetolagnaro.org/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 47, Tolagnaro 614, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (022)92.210.18

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Madagascar {Madagascar Meridionale}
16 January 1896ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Madagascar Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Madagascar {Madagascar Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin
20 May 1913Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Madagascar {Madagascar Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin
Diocese of Fort-Dauphin
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin Diocese of Fort-Dauphin
8 April 1957Territory LostDiocese of Fort-Dauphin Diocese of Farafangana (erected)
8 April 1957Territory LostDiocese of Fort-Dauphin Diocese of Tuléar (erected)
13 April 1967Territory LostDiocese of Fort-Dauphin
Diocese of Farafangana
Diocese of Ihosy (erected)
Diocese of Tôlagnaro
23 November 1989Name ChangedDiocese of Fort-Dauphin Diocese of Tôlagnaro
3 December 2003Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tôlagnaro (from Fianarantsoa)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin
195067,500900,0007.5%632381,7763259177ap1951
Diocese of Fort-Dauphin
197019,000371,5505.1%22224791326313ap1971
198031,000480,0006.5%33336861497516ap1981
Diocese of Tôlagnaro
199052,000600,0008.7%332351,485447215ap1991
199980,080856,2009.4%927362,224418412ap2000
200075,500825,0009.2%728352,1574213012ap2001
200178,304689,41611.4%825332,3723611112ap2002
200294,972825,00011.5%826342,7933810313ap2003
200394,972824,00011.5%828362,6383710413ap2004
2004100,000860,00011.6%928372,7024711816ap2005
201097,1781,008,0009.6%1121323,0363710016ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013