Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Toliara

Archidioecesis Toliaranus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Fulgence Rabeony, S.J., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 December 2003
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 43,570 (16,828 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 30, Toliara 601, Madagascar
  • Telephone: 94.424.16

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tuléar
8 April 1957ErectedDiocese of Fort-Dauphin Diocese of Tuléar (erected)
Diocese of Toliara
28 October 1989Name ChangedDiocese of Tuléar Diocese of Toliara
Archdiocese of Toliara
3 December 2003ElevatedDiocese of Toliara Archdiocese of Toliara

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tuléar
197036,000350,00010.3%218201,800426610ap1971
198035,670405,0008.8%219211,698298914ap1981
Diocese of Toliara
199056,000791,1967.1%328311,8065019814ap1991
199986,000722,00011.9%926352,4575020720ap2000
200087,000750,00011.6%925342,5585821619ap2002
200265,000700,0009.3%928371,7567524020ap2003
Archdiocese of Toliara
200377,603795,0009.8%1133441,7636424420ap2004
200479,000795,0009.9%1038481,6455627919ap2005
201094,645912,00010.4%2240621,5266727721ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 9 Jul 2012