Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Bombin Espino, O.SS.T.

Bishop of Maintirano, Madagascar

Apostolic Administrator of Mahajanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1960 Born
21 Mar 198726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
4 Oct 200343.0AppointedBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
8 Feb 200443.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
8 Feb 201756.3AppointedBishop of Maintirano, Madagascar
13 Nov 201858.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mahajanga, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Bombin Espino
Bishop Gustavo Bombin Espino O.SS.T. (born ) Bishop of Maintirano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Llorente, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained Bishopstade de la ville, Tsiroanomandidy, Diocese of Tsiroanomandidy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maintirano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,525
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2017
  • ab: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast