Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gilbert Ramanantoanina, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1916Born
1 Aug 194831.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jan 196043.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar
12 Jan 196043.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
24 Apr 196043.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acmonia
2 Apr 196245.3AppointedArchbishop of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar
25 Jan 199174.1DiedArchbishop of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Ramanantoanina
Archbishop Gilbert Ramanantoanina S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Fianarantsoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbositra

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018