Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme Razafindrazaka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tamatave, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1915Born
25 Jul 194732.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 197257.0AppointedBishop of Tamatave, Madagascar
15 Aug 197257.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tamatave, Madagascar
15 May 198974.1RetiredBishop of Tamatave, Madagascar
1 Aug 199277.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tamatave, Madagascar

MicroData Summary
Jérôme Razafindrazaka
Bishop Jérôme Razafindrazaka
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Tamatave

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndriampamaky
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de Lourdes, Church, Tamatave, Diocese of Tamatave

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 3 May 2025