Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Botsy, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ambanja, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1940Born
16 Sep 196222.2EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Sep 196323.2First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Oct 196727.3Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Mar 196928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Jul 197636.0AppointedBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
3 Oct 197636.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
25 Oct 199757.3ResignedBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
30 Apr 202584.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ambanja, Madagascar

MicroData Summary
Ferdinand Botsy
Bishop Ferdinand Botsy O.F.M. Cap.
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Ambanja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHell Ville, Nosy-Bé
Ordained PriestStrasbourg, Diocese of Strasbourg, France
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Ambanja, Diocese of Ambanja
Death PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,433
  • d/qfmc/loc: CB, 2 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 3 May 2025