Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Julien Pierre Fortineau, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Diégo-Suarez

Titular Bishop of Chytri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1873BornMachecoul, France
5 Mar 189825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 Jul 191441.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar
17 Jul 191441.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chytri
26 Jul 191441.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar
21 Nov 191542.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chytri
Apr 1946³73.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar
9 Feb 194875.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Auguste Julien Pierre Fortineau:
Bishop Auguste Julien Pierre Fortineau C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Diégo-Suarez

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013