Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Auguste-Marie Pichot, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Majunga

Titular Bishop of Raphanea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1874BornLes Cresnays, France
18 Oct 189925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
26 Mar 192348.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Majunga, Madagascar
26 Mar 192348.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Raphanea
30 Jun 192348.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Raphanea
10 May 194065.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Majunga, Madagascar
20 Sep 195480.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Majunga, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Paul-Auguste-Marie Pichot:
Bishop Paul-Auguste-Marie Pichot C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Majunga

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015