Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Fianarantsoa

Archidioecesis Fianarantsoaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 December 1958
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 29,400 (11,355 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 1440, Ecar Ambozontany, Fianarantsoa 301, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020)755.00.27

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
10 May 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa (erected)
18 June 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Prefecture Apostolic of Vatomandry (erected)
8 January 1938Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Morondava (erected)
Diocese of Fianarantsoa
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa Diocese of Fianarantsoa
Archdiocese of Fianarantsoa
11 December 1958ElevatedDiocese of Fianarantsoa Archdiocese of Fianarantsoa
9 April 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Fianarantsoa
Diocese of Tamatave
Diocese of Mananjary (erected)
3 June 1999Territory LostArchdiocese of Fianarantsoa Diocese of Ambositra (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
1950187,500650,00028.8%281832,259811051ap1951
Diocese of Fianarantsoa
Archdiocese of Fianarantsoa
1970358,060792,00045.2%111181292,7751982348ap1971
1980455,000975,00046.7%261031293,5271682658ap1981
1990578,1621,323,76243.7%30891194,8581673337ap1991
1999426,858920,98146.3%542232771,5414042969ap2000
2000436,726974,10644.8%49761253,4932493528ap2001
2001418,749995,76042.1%48861343,1242913357ap2002
2002432,4741,039,76041.6%42831253,4592613277ap2003
2003452,4861,119,86040.4%46821283,5352503378ap2004
2004467,4761,153,75040.5%43781213,8632533419ap2005
2006576,6701,201,00048.0%44841284,5052483439ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.4, 30 Dec 2012; data: 30 Dec 2012