Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Antsirabé

Dioecesis Antsirabensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Betafó
15 May 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Central Madagascar {Madagascar Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Betafó (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Betafó
24 August 1918ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Betafó Vicariate Apostolic of Betafó
Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé
10 January 1921Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Betafó Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé
8 January 1938ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Morondava (erected)
Diocese of Antsirabé
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé Diocese of Antsirabé

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé
1950127,652236,58054.0%325284,55941472ap1951
Diocese of Antsirabé
1958180,421333,58054.1%2101215,03574662ap1960
1970270,293550554,9145813222ap1971
1980362,548628,70957.7%1129409,063831343ap1981
1990580,834992,04958.5%23295211,1698818126ap1991
1994504,643952,66453.0%4536816,23012123425ap2000
2000728,0001,300,00056.0%3752898,17911625625ap2001
2001729,0001,315,00055.4%3950898,19111526725ap2002
2002732,3051,332,50055.0%4342858,61510634424ap2003
2003736,4001,341,30054.9%4740878,46412135425ap2004
2004728,0001,318,00055.2%48591076,80319233225ap2005
2006799,5741,355,00059.0%56621186,77619329325ap2007
2012845,2451,903,30044.4%58571157,34918428827ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013