Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Ramananarivo, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antsirabé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1934BornBelanitra
14 Aug 196531.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
11 Nov 199460.4AppointedBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
18 Jun 199561.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
13 Nov 200975.4RetiredBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar
12 May 201378.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Antsirabé, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Félix Ramananarivo:
Bishop Félix Ramananarivo M.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antsirabé

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,596
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015