Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Guy Rakodondravahatra, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ihosy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1934BornTsarahonenana
19 Jul 196026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
25 Mar 197238.1AppointedBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar
2 Jul 197238.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar
21 Sep 199662.6DiedBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean-Guy Rakodondravahatra:
Bishop Jean-Guy Rakodondravahatra M.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Ihosy

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013