Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Alphonse Marie Sartre, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tananarive

Titular Archbishop of Beroë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1902BornSaint-Denis, France
28 Aug 193229.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Mar 194845.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tananarive, Madagascar
11 Mar 194845.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
17 Jul 194845.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
14 Sep 195553.0AppointedArchbishop of Tananarive, Madagascar
12 Jan 196057.3ResignedArchbishop of Tananarive, Madagascar
12 Jan 196057.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beroë
13 Oct 200098.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tananarive, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Victor Alphonse Marie Sartre:
Archbishop Victor Alphonse Marie Sartre S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tananarive

  • a priest for 68.1 years
  • a bishop for 52.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 81
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013