Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Ranaivo

Deceased

Bishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1894Born
18 Feb 192530.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 195864.1AppointedBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
21 Sep 195864.3Ordained BishopBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
30 Apr 195964.9DiedBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Edouard Ranaivo
Bishop Edouard Ranaivo (born , died ) Bishop of Miarinarivo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbohimianina

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1959
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018