Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Batiot, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Majunga

Titular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1898BornChantonnay, France
31 Jul 192728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
13 Feb 194748.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Majunga, Madagascar
13 Feb 194748.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
25 May 194748.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
31 Aug 195354.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Majunga, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean Batiot:
Bishop Jean Batiot C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Majunga

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015