Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Ranaivomanana

Bishop of Antsirabé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1949 BornSarobatra
16 Oct 197728.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 199949.6AppointedBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar
13 May 199950.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ihosy, Madagascar
13 Nov 200960.5AppointedBishop of Antsirabé, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Philippe Ranaivomanana:
Bishop Philippe Ranaivomanana (born ) Bishop of Antsirabé

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antsirabé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 27 Nov 2013