Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benjamin Marc Balthason Ramaroson, C.M.

Archbishop of Antsiranana, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1955 Born
15 Oct 198025.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
15 Aug 198429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
26 Nov 200550.5AppointedBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
25 Mar 200650.9Ordained BishopBishop of Farafangana, Madagascar
27 Nov 201358.5AppointedArchbishop of Antsiranana, Madagascar
25 Jan 201458.7InstalledArchbishop of Antsiranana, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Benjamin Marc Balthason Ramaroson
Archbishop Benjamin Marc Balthason Ramaroson C.M. (born ) Archbishop of Antsiranana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManakara

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Antsiranana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,094
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2013
  • i: CB, 6 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast