Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alwin Albert Hafner, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Morombe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1930BornBalsthal
28 Jun 195726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
15 May 198958.6AppointedBishop of Morombe, Madagascar
22 Apr 199059.6Ordained BishopBishop of Morombe, Madagascar
15 Jul 200069.8ResignedBishop of Morombe, Madagascar
7 Jan 201685.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Morombe, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Alwin Albert Hafner:
Bishop Alwin Albert Hafner M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Morombe

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,787
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: CB, 23 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 25 Jan 2016