Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Charles Ratsimamotoana, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Morondava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1925BornBéthania
25 Sep 195530.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
29 Sep 196439.1AppointedBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
3 Dec 196439.3Ordained BishopBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
8 Aug 199873.0ResignedBishop of Morondava, Madagascar
18 Oct 200580.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Morondava, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Bernard Charles Ratsimamotoana:
Bishop Bernard Charles Ratsimamotoana M.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Morondava

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013