Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Razakarinvony

Bishop Emeritus of Miarinarivo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1927 BornAntananarivo
27 Jul 195628.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 199870.2AppointedBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
17 May 199870.5Ordained BishopBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
15 Feb 200779.2RetiredBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Raymond Razakarinvony:
Bishop Raymond Razakarinvony (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Miarinarivo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Miarinarivo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,324
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013