Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Claude Randrianarisoa

Bishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1961 Born
21 Sep 199129.7Ordained PriestPriest of Antananarivo, Madagascar
15 Feb 200745.1AppointedBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar
20 May 200745.4Ordained BishopBishop of Miarinarivo, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean Claude Randrianarisoa
Bishop Jean Claude Randrianarisoa (born ) Bishop of Miarinarivo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNandihizana Carion

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Miarinarivo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,422
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,477

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017