Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Odon Marie Arsène Razanakolona

Archbishop of Antananarivo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1946 BornFianarantsoa
28 Dec 197529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar
28 Nov 199852.5AppointedBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
11 Apr 199952.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
7 Dec 200559.5AppointedArchbishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar
12 Feb 200659.7InstalledArchbishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Odon Marie Arsène Razanakolona:
Archbishop Odon Marie Arsène Razanakolona (born ) Archbishop of Antananarivo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Antananarivo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,497

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013