Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Malo, Ist. del Prado

Archbishop Emeritus of Antsiranana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1938 BornMaroantsetra
15 Aug 197133.3Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
1 Sep 198850.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Majunga, Madagascar
1 Sep 198850.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
11 Dec 198850.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
18 Oct 199355.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antsiranana, Madagascar
29 Mar 199658.0AppointedBishop of Mahajanga, Madagascar
28 Nov 199860.6AppointedArchbishop of Antsiranana, Madagascar
27 Nov 201375.6RetiredArchbishop of Antsiranana, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Michel Malo:
Archbishop Michel Malo Ist. del Prado (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Antsiranana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Antsiranana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,239
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015