Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Désiré Cardinal Tsarahazana

Archbishop of Toamasina, Madagascar

Cardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1954 Born
28 Sep 198632.2Ordained PriestPriest of Antsirabé, Madagascar
30 Oct 200046.3AppointedBishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Madagascar
18 Feb 200146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Madagascar
24 Nov 200854.4AppointedBishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
26 Feb 201055.7AppointedArchbishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
28 Jun 201864.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201864.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane
23 Dec 201864.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane

MicroData Summary for Désiré Tsarahazana (VIAF: 309917511)
Désiré Cardinal Tsarahazana (born ) Archbishop of Toamasina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmboangibe
Ordained BishopNear, Saint-Maurice, Cathedral, Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Diocese of Fenoarivo Atsinanana

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Toamasina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,914
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 18 Dec 2018

Quantcast