Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Randrianantenaina

Bishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1969 Born
31 May 199728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar
13 May 200637.2IncardinatedPriest of Moramanga, Madagascar
30 Apr 202152.1AppointedBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar
11 Jul 202152.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tsiroanomandidy, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Randrianantenaina
Bishop Gabriel Randrianantenaina (born ) Bishop of Tsiroanomandidy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTanambe, Diocese of Ambatondrazaka
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Kianja Lycée Publique, Tsiroanomandidy, Diocese of Tsiroanomandidy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tsiroanomandidy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2021
  • ob: CB, 21 May 2021
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jul 2021

Quantcast