Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Scopelliti, O.SS.T.

Bishop Emeritus of Ambatondrazaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1939 BornGallico Superiore
18 Dec 196526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
21 Jan 199151.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar
5 May 199152.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar
6 Mar 199353.9SucceededBishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar
11 Apr 201576.0RetiredBishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Antoine Scopelliti:
Bishop Antoine Scopelliti O.SS.T. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ambatondrazaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ambatondrazaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,404
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015