Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vòllaro, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ambatondrazaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1915BornGrumo Nevano, Italy
8 Apr 193924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
19 Dec 195944.9AppointedBishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar
1 May 196045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar
6 Mar 199378.1RetiredBishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar
23 Jun 200489.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vòllaro:
Bishop Francesco Vòllaro O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ambatondrazaka

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 36
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013