Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Paul Futy, M.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Antsirabé

Titular Bishop of Aspendus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1889BornPoitiers, France
14 Jul 191223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
21 Jan 193848.7AppointedPrefect of Morondava, Madagascar
13 Feb 194757.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aspendus
13 Feb 194757.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Antsirabé, Madagascar
27 Apr 194757.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aspendus
10 Mar 195565.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Antsirabé, Madagascar
12 Aug 195667.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Antsirabé, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Paul Futy:
Bishop Joseph-Paul Futy M.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Antsirabé

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015