Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Emile-Marie Cléret de Langavant, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1896BornSaint-Malo, France
23 Sep 192226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Dec 193438.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
25 Apr 193539.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
21 Oct 196064.7ResignedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
21 Oct 196064.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
21 Jul 197175.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
16 Sep 199195.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for François-Emile-Marie Cléret de Langavant:
Bishop François-Emile-Marie Cléret de Langavant C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

  • a priest for 69.0 years
  • a bishop for 56.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013