Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Leen, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Port-Louis

Titular Archbishop of Phasis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1888BornAbbeyfeale, Ireland
11 Jul 192032.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Jul 192537.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
15 Jul 192537.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
13 Sep 192537.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
16 Apr 192638.3SucceededBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
1 Aug 193345.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Port-Louis, Mauritius
1 Aug 193345.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phasis
19 Dec 194962.0DiedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for James Leen:
Archbishop James Leen C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Port-Louis

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013