Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William MacNeely

Deceased

Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1888Born
4 Feb 191223.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 192334.3AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
22 Jul 192334.5Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
11 Dec 196374.9DiedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William MacNeely
Bishop William MacNeely (born , died ) Bishop of Raphoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonegal Town

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018