Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles McHugh

Deceased

Bishop of Derry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1856BornDreenan
1881¹24.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 190750.9AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
29 Sep 190751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
12 Feb 192669.5DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles McHugh:
Bishop Charles McHugh (born , died ) Bishop of Derry

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013