Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Austin Quinn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1892BornDerrynoose
20 Jun 191523.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 195058.3AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
10 Sep 195058.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
11 Oct 197280.5RetiredBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
24 Sep 197482.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Austin Quinn:
Bishop Austin Quinn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015