Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene O’Callaghan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1888Born
22 Jun 191325.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 194355.0AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
4 Apr 194355.2Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
28 Nov 196981.8RetiredBishop of Clogher, Ireland
28 Nov 196981.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Britonia
26 Jan 197183.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Britonia
21 May 197385.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Eugene O’Callaghan
Bishop Eugene O’Callaghan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisseraw, Camlough

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,943, Number 17
  • bd/op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,973, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast