Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Mulhern

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1863Born
16 Sep 188926.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 191653.0AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
30 Apr 191653.2Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
12 Aug 194380.5DiedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Edward Mulhern
Bishop Edward Mulhern (born , died ) Bishop of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEderney

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,916, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast