Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John J. Reddington, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jos, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1910Born
10 Jun 193423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
10 Apr 195443.7AppointedBishop of Jos, Nigeria
29 Jun 195444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jos, Nigeria
3 Jul 197464.0ResignedBishop of Jos, Nigeria
3 Oct 199484.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Jos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John J. Reddington
Bishop John J. Reddington S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthlone, Ireland

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018