Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Lucey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cork and Ross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1902BornBallinacollig
19 Jun 192724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
14 Nov 195048.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cork, Ireland
14 Nov 195048.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sila
14 Jan 195148.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sila
24 Aug 195250.1SucceededBishop of Cork, Ireland
20 Feb 195451.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ross, Ireland
19 Apr 195855.7AppointedBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland
23 Aug 198078.1RetiredBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland
24 Sep 198280.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cork and Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Lucey:
Bishop Cornelius Lucey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cork and Ross

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015