Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Cork and Ross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1924BornKilmichael
19 Jun 194925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cork and Ross, Ireland
1 Apr 197652.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland
1 Apr 197652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sila
23 May 197652.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sila
23 Aug 198056.5SucceededBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland
7 Oct 199672.6DiedBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Murphy:
Bishop Michael Murphy (born , died ) Bishop of Cork and Ross

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013