Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Coveney

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Greece

Titular Archbishop of Satrianum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1934 BornCork, Ireland
21 Feb 195924.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 198550.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Satrianum
27 Jul 198550.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Zimbabwe
15 Sep 198551.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Satrianum
25 Jan 199055.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ethiopia
26 Mar 199257.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Djibouti
27 Apr 199661.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to New Zealand
27 Apr 199661.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
27 Apr 199661.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
27 Apr 199661.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Oct 199662.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Oct 199662.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kiribata, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Oct 199662.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Micronesia, Federated States of, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Oct 199662.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
7 Dec 199662.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nauru, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Jul 200166.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Jul 200166.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Palau, Pacific (Oceania)
25 Jan 200570.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Greece
16 Jul 200974.9RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Greece

MicroData Summary for Patrick Coveney:
Archbishop Patrick Coveney (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Greece

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Greece.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015