Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
20 June 1973 | Split | Delegation to New Zealand and Pacific Islands | Nunciature to New Zealand (and Elevated)
Delegation to Pacific Ocean |
1 June 1992 | Established | Delegation to Pacific Ocean | Nunciature to Nauru |
30 December 1993 | Established | Delegation to Pacific Ocean | Nunciature to Marshall Islands |
26 January 1994 | Established | Delegation to Pacific Ocean | Nunciature to Micronesia, Federated States of |
10 June 1994 | Established | Delegation to Pacific Ocean | Nunciature to Samoa |
20 July 1994 | Established | Delegation to Pacific Ocean | Nunciature to Vanuatu |
24 August 1994 | Established | Delegation to Pacific Ocean | Nunciature to Tonga |
10 April 1995 | Established | Delegation to Pacific Ocean | Nunciature to Kiribati |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 30 May 2023 |
✠