Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Krebs

Apostolic Nuncio to New Zealand

Titular Archbishop of Taborenta

Apostolic Nuncio to Cook Islands

Apostolic Nuncio to Fiji

Apostolic Nuncio to Micronesia, Federated States of

Apostolic Nuncio to Kiribata

Apostolic Nuncio to Marshall Islands

Apostolic Nuncio to Nauru

Apostolic Delegate to Pacific Oceania

Apostolic Nuncio to Palau

Apostolic Nuncio to Tonga

Apostolic Nuncio to Vanuatu

Apostolic Nuncio to Samoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1956 BornEssen, Germany
10 Oct 198326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Essen, Germany
8 Sep 200851.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Taborenta
8 Sep 200851.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea
8 Sep 200851.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mali
16 Nov 200852.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Taborenta
8 May 201356.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to New Zealand
8 May 201356.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
8 May 201356.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kiribata, Pacific (Oceania)
8 May 201356.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Palau, Pacific (Oceania)
8 May 201356.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Micronesia, Federated States of, Pacific (Oceania)
8 May 201356.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Pacific Oceania
23 Sep 201356.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
23 Sep 201356.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
23 Sep 201356.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
18 Jan 201457.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
3 May 201457.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
3 May 201457.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nauru, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Martin Krebs:
Archbishop Martin Krebs (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of New Zealand

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to New Zealand.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2008
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,986
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Sep 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014