Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Beat Grögli

Bishop-Elect of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1970 Born
16 Aug 199827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
22 May 202554.6AppointedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
5 Jul 202554.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary
Beat Grögli
Father Beat Grögli
(born )
Bishop-Elect of Sankt Gallen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWil

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Sankt Gallen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2025
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 22 May 2025