Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Manuel Alí Herrera

Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Iubaltiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1967 Born
28 Nov 199225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
7 Nov 201548.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
7 Nov 201548.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Iubaltiana
12 Dec 201548.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iubaltiana

MicroData Summary for Luis Manuel Alí Herrera
Bishop Luis Manuel Alí Herrera (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarranquilla

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bogotá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 8 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 11 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017