Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivo Fürer

Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1930 BornGossau
3 Apr 195424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
28 Mar 199564.9SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
29 Mar 199564.9ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
5 Jun 199565.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
16 Oct 200575.5RetiredBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Ivo Fürer:
Bishop Ivo Fürer (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sankt Gallen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013